THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 6:00:28 AM
Isaacson, Steven
CPSO#:
55070
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Jan 1985
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
31 Jul 1986
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of the Witwatersrand Faculty, 1984
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
True North Imaging
120 - 7330 Yonge St
Thornhill ON L4J 7Y7
Phone: (905) 707-1777
Fax: (905) 707-0616
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:29 May 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. STEVEN ISAACSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ISAACSON is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jan 1985 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 31 Jul 1986 |