skip to content

Akhtar, Sabrina Nadine

CPSO#: 86508

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Family Medicine
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5888
Fax: (416) 603-5821 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Akhtar and Alam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Akhtar ( CPSO# 86508 )
Dr. A. Alam ( CPSO# 86825 )

Business Address:
300 Bathurst Street
West Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Business Address:
103 - 20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 800-1848

Business Address:
Unit 601
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SABRINA NADINE AKHTAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKHTAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2009