skip to content

Alam, Asimul

CPSO#: 86825

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Suite 1E-176
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6520
Fax: 855-756-3454 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Kensington Screening Clinic
340 College Street
Toronto, ON
Toronto ON  M5T 3A9
Canada
Phone: (416) 928-9511
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Holly Street Endoscopy Clinic
40 Holly St #01
Toronto, ON
M4S 3C3
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Canada
Phone: (416) 486-8088
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie Street
Suite 1E-176
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: 416-756-6520
Fax: 855-756-3454
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

#103 - 20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Canada
Phone: 4168001848
Fax: 4164412114
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Akhtar and Alam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Akhtar ( CPSO# 86508 )
Dr. A. Alam ( CPSO# 86825 )

Business Address:
300 Bathurst Street
West Wing
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5888

Business Address:
103 - 20 Wynford Drive
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 800-1848

Business Address:
Unit 601
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6520

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASIMUL ALAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Transfusion Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012