skip to content

Aboobaker, Shaheer

CPSO#: 110401

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 07 Oct 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2021

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education: University of Kwazulu-Natal, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Retina Institute
6 Maginn Mews
North York ON  M3C 0G9
Phone: (416) 449-3937 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

416-155 King St E
Oshawa ON  L1H 7T8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

12-9080 Yonge St
Richmond Hill Medical and Surgical
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
Phone: +1 289 597 767
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

1425 Cornwall Rd
Oakville ON  L6J 7T5
Canada
Phone: 647-478-2402
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Chow Berger Koushan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Berger ( CPSO# 52456 )
Dr. D. Chow ( CPSO# 62433 )
Dr. K. Koushan ( CPSO# 86788 )
Dr. S. Aboobaker ( CPSO# 110401)

Business Address:
Toronto Retina Institute
Suite 208
6 Maginn Mews
Toronto ON  M3C 0G9
Phone Number: (416) 449-3937


Corporation Name: S. Aboobaker Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Aboobaker ( CPSO# 110401)

Business Address:
Toronto Retina Institute
6 Maginn Mews
Suite 208
North York ON  M3C 0G9
Phone Number: (416) 449-3937


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



South Africa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:15 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHAHEER ABOOBAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOOBAKER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Oct 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2021