THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 17:29:06 PM
Aboobaker, Shaheer
CPSO#:
110401
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
07 Oct 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
13 Jun 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Afrikaans, English
Education: University of Kwazulu-Natal, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Retina Institute
6 Maginn Mews
North York ON M3C 0G9
Phone: (416) 449-3937
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
South Africa
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:15 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SHAHEER ABOOBAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABOOBAKER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 22 Sep 2016
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 23 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Oct 2018 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 07 Oct 2020 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 13 Jun 2021 |