skip to content

Revah, Giselle

CPSO#: 86656

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Radiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: 6137378899 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ayala Revah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Silverberg ( CPSO# 65479 )
Dr. A. Revah ( CPSO# 68151 )
Dr. G. Revah ( CPSO# 86656 )

Business Address:
Suite 311
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 3V7
Phone Number: (416) 743-2107


Corporation Name: Dr. Giselle Revah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Revah ( CPSO# 86656 )

Business Address:
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Radiology
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GISELLE REVAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REVAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2014