skip to content

Revah, Ayala

CPSO#: 68151

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jul 1999
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1999

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 311
2065 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 2V7
Phone: (416) 743-2107
Fax: (416) 743-6441 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ayala Revah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Silverberg ( CPSO# 65479 )
Dr. A. Revah ( CPSO# 68151 )
Dr. G. Revah ( CPSO# 86656 )

Business Address:
Suite 311
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 3V7
Phone Number: (416) 743-2107

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AYALA REVAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REVAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1999