skip to content

Silverberg, Mark Steven

CPSO#: 65479

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1992
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 1993

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 University Avenue
Room 441
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-4800 Ext. 8236
Fax: (416) 619-5524 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 360A
700 Lawrence Avenue West
North York ON  M6A3B4
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ayala Revah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Silverberg ( CPSO# 65479 )
Dr. A. Revah ( CPSO# 68151 )
Dr. G. Revah ( CPSO# 86656 )

Business Address:
Suite 311
2065 Finch Avenue West
Toronto ON  M3N 3V7
Phone Number: (416) 743-2107


Corporation Name: Mark Silverberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Silverberg ( CPSO# 65479 )

Business Address:
Room 441
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:30 Sep 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARK STEVEN SILVERBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SILVERBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
CF - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993