First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |