THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 19:05:01 PM
Zwingerman, Rhonda Gina
CPSO#:
97137
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
30 Jun 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Queen's University, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
313 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON M5N 1A1
Phone: 416-855-8944
Fax: 416-987-2256
Electoral District: 10
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:30 Jun 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility |
Effective:30 Dec 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RHONDA GINA ZWINGERMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZWINGERMAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 16 Jan 2012 to 12 Feb 2012
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 22 Oct 2012 to 09 Nov 2012
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 19 Nov 2012 to 16 Dec 2012
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
McMaster University, 26 Aug 2013 to 13 Sep 2013
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2013 to 08 Nov 2013
EL - Obstetrics and Gynecology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - Gynecologic Reproductive Endocrinology/Infertility
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Feb 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 09 Nov 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 19 Nov 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 16 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Aug 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 13 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 08 Nov 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2014 |