skip to content

Kandel, Rita Arbetman

CPSO#: 50880

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept of Pathology & Lab Medicine
Room 6-500
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8516
Fax: (416) 586-8719 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Gabor Kandel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kandel ( CPSO# 50879 )
Dr. R. Kandel ( CPSO# 50880 )
Dr. C. Kandel ( CPSO# 95948 )

Business Address:
St. Michael's Hospital
30 Bond Street
Suite 16-060
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-3093

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Nov 1983 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RITA ARBETMAN KANDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANDEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Aug 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1987