THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:46:07 PM
Kandel, Rita Arbetman
CPSO#:
50880
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Jul 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Jul 1987
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 1978
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
Dept of Pathology & Lab Medicine
Room 6-500
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X5
Phone: (416) 586-8516
Fax: (416) 586-8719
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Baycrest Hospital |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Women's College Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anatomical Pathology |
Effective:30 Nov 1983 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. RITA ARBETMAN KANDEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANDEL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 1978 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 28 Jun 1983 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 29 Aug 1984 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Jul 1987 |