skip to content

Parkinson, Matthew Ramcharan

CPSO#: 86268

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Dec 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Dec 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Meno Ya Win Health Centre
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone: 807-737-3030 Ext. 4403
Fax: 807-737-5273 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Matthew Ramcharan Parkinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Parkinson ( CPSO# 86268 )

Business Address:
Meno Ya Win Health Centre
1 Meno Ya Win Way
Sioux Lookout ON  P8T 1B4
Phone Number: (807) 737-3030


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Newfoundland and Labrador

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:10 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW RAMCHARAN PARKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARKINSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 25 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Queen's University, 26 Aug 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - General Surgery

Queen's University, 15 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Nov 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2016