Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: December 18, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On December 18, 2023, the following Bail Conditions were imposed on Matthew Parkinson:
1. Parkinson must notify Police of any change to his address.
2. Parkinson must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with named persons.
3. Parkinson must not go to any known place of employment, residence, school or worship for named persons.
4. Parkinson must not enter a named location.
5. Parkinson must not possess a firearm, crossbow, prohibited weapon, restricted weapon, prohibited device, ammunition, prohibited ammunition or explosive substance, and must surrender those that are in his possession and also any authorization, licence or registration certificate or other document enabling him to acquire or possess them to Police.
5. Parkinson must surrender his Restricted Possession and Acquisition Licence to Police.
Source:
Other
Active Date: December 15, 2023
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Matthew Parkinson was charged with the following offences:
1. Three Counts of Uttering Threats – to cause death or bodily harm, between January 1, 2021 and August 30, 2021, contrary to section 264.1(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. Assault, between August 1, 2021 and August 30, 2021 contrary to section 266 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
3. Forcible Confinement, between August 1, 2021 and August 30, 2021, contrary to section 279(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
4. Harassing Communications, on or about April 27, 2023, contrary to section 372(3) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
5. Careless storage of Firearm, Weapon, Prohibited Device or Ammunition, on or about December 15, 2023, contrary to section 86(1) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
6. Two Counts of Possession of a Prohibited Device or Ammunition, on or about December 15, 2023, contrary to section 92(2) of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: December 15, 2023
Place of Charge: Sioux Lookout
Ontario Provincial Police