First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jul 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Apr 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 May 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2017 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 31 May 2024 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2023 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2023 |