THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 11:50:59 AM
Krishnan, Pradeep
CPSO#:
98956
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jun 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Rajasthan University, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
The Hospital for Sick children
Diagnostic imaging
Paediatric Neuroradiology
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G 1X8
Phone: (416) 813-1500
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hospital For Sick Children |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:01 Jun 2017 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 02 Sep 2012
PEAP - CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 03 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric Radiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Neuroradiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 May 2017
CF - Pediatric Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 06 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Jul 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Jul 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Apr 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 May 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jun 2017 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 31 May 2024 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2023 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Oct 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 28 Sep 2023 |
|
Active |