First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 24 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2023 |