THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
02/05/24 16:18:37 PM
Agid, Ofer
CPSO#:
76591
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
23 Dec 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
23 Dec 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Hebrew
Education: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical S, 1994
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CAMH
Department of Psychiatry
1001 Queen St West
Toronto ON M6J 1H4
Phone: (416) 535-8501
Electoral District: 10
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health - College Street Site |
Toronto |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health |
Toronto |
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,- Russell Street Site |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:06 Dec 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2001 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Jun 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Jun 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 23 Dec 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Sep 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Aug 2012 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 24 Aug 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2023 |
|
Active |