skip to content

Nagji, Noorbegum

CPSO#: 54339

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Aug 1987
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Aug 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Swahili, Urdu

Education: University of Karachi, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
B6 - 45 Overlea Blvd
North York ON  M4A 1X1
Phone: (416) 696-9836
Fax: (416) 696-8080 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N. Nagji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nagji ( CPSO# 54339 )
Dr. A. Nagji ( CPSO# 87583 )
Dr. A. Nagji ( CPSO# 105702)

Business Address:
Suite B6
45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4A 1X1
Phone Number: (416) 696-9836


Corporation Name: Alim Nagji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nagji ( CPSO# 54339 )
Dr. A. Nagji ( CPSO# 105702)
Dr. R. Bana ( CPSO# 106724)

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital Emergency Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
St Joseph Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NOORBEGUM NAGJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGJI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 1987