skip to content

Nagji, Alim

CPSO#: 105702

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Apr 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Apr 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicin, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Joseph Brant Hospital Emergency Dep
1230 North Shore Boulevard East
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone: (905) 632-3737 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Emergency Department
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Canada
Phone: (905) 522-1155
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N. Nagji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 27 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nagji ( CPSO# 54339 )
Dr. A. Nagji ( CPSO# 87583 )
Dr. A. Nagji ( CPSO# 105702)

Business Address:
Suite B6
45 Overlea Boulevard
Toronto ON  M4A 1X1
Phone Number: (416) 696-9836


Corporation Name: Alim Nagji Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Nagji ( CPSO# 54339 )
Dr. A. Nagji ( CPSO# 105702)
Dr. R. Bana ( CPSO# 106724)

Business Address:
St. Mary's Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital Emergency Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 742-3611

Business Address:
Joseph Brant Hospital
1245 Lakeshore Boulevard
Burlington ON  L7S 1W7
Phone Number: (905) 632-3737

Business Address:
St Joseph Hospital
50 Charlton Avenue
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALIM NAGJI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAGJI is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2015