skip to content

Charania, Naveen Nawaz

CPSO#: 87704

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Swahili, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1615 Dundas Street East,
#207
Inside Whitby Mall
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone: (289) 240-3740
Fax: (905) 240-3740 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Naveen N. Charania Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Charania ( CPSO# 87704 )

Business Address:
Whitby Urgent Care/ Walk In Clinic
1615 Dundas Street East
Suite 207
Inside Whitby Mall
Whitby ON  L1N 2L1
Phone Number: (289) 240-3740

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Dec 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAVEEN NAWAZ CHARANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARANIA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2007 to 04 Dec 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 05 Dec 2007 to 11 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2008 to 11 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2009
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.