THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 1:39:29 AM
Charania, Naveen Nawaz
CPSO#:
87704
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Dec 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Dec 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, Gujarati, Hindi, Kachchi, Swahili, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 1981
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1615 Dundas Street East,
#207
Inside Whitby Mall
Whitby ON L1N 2L1
Phone: (289) 240-3740
Fax: (905) 240-3740
Electoral District: 05
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:09 Dec 2009 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NAVEEN NAWAZ CHARANIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARANIA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2007 to 04 Dec 2007
AVP - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 05 Dec 2007 to 11 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
University of Toronto, 12 Sep 2008 to 11 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 11 Sep 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Dec 2009 |