skip to content

Asady, Mohammad Anwar

CPSO#: 75456

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Feb 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Feb 2004

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Dari, English, Farsi, Persian, Urdu

Education: University of Peshawar, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1505- HURONTARIO STREET
MISSISSAUGA ON  L5G 3H7
Phone: 905-232-1007
Fax: 905-990-7999

Additional Practice Location(s)

Trillium Health Partners , M site
100 Queensway street west
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: 9058487557
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Asady Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Asady ( CPSO# 75456 )

Business Address:
1505-Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5G H7
Phone Number: 9052321007

Business Address:
Suite 102
2338 Hurontario Street
Mississauga ON  L5B 1N1
Phone Number: (905) 252-1007

Business Address:
Trillium Health Centre - Mississauga Site
Dept of Paediatric/ Neonatology
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 484-7557

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:20 Feb 2004 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jul 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Feb 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jun 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 27 Feb 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 May 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 29 Sep 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 09 Mar 2012 Active
 Dr. Mohammad Anwar Asady may practise medicine independently in Paediatrics and
            Neonatology, only.