THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
30/04/24 7:52:23 AM
Asady, Mohammad Anwar
CPSO#:
75456
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
20 Feb 2004
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
20 Feb 2004
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Dari, English, Farsi, Persian, Urdu
Education: University of Peshawar, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1505- HURONTARIO STREET
MISSISSAUGA ON L5G 3H7
Phone: 905-232-1007
Fax: 905-990-7999
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Pediatrics |
Effective:20 Feb 2004 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Feb 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Feb 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 May 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Sep 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 29 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |
|
Active |