First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Jul 2000 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2002 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2002 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Jul 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Feb 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Feb 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 25 Jun 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Oct 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Dec 2007 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 27 Feb 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 08 Sep 2008 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Apr 2009 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 May 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 29 Sep 2010 |
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. |
Effective: 29 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2011 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Mar 2012 |