skip to content

Royle, Mary-Clare Hogan

CPSO#: 79207

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CF Health Services Centre Ottawa
101 Colonel by Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2
Phone: (613) 945-1111 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mary-Clare Royle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Royle ( CPSO# 79207 )
Dr. G. Fleury ( CPSO# 86118 )

Business Address:
CF Health Services Centre Ottawa
101 Colonel by Drive
Ottawa ON  K1A 0K2


Corporation Name: Dr. Gilles Fleury Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 15 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Royle ( CPSO# 79207 )
Dr. G. Fleury ( CPSO# 86118 )

Business Address:
Suite 1
53 Marier Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1L 5S2
Phone Number: (613) 701-8337

Business Address:
Montfort Hospital
Room 0B190
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T3
Phone Number: (613) 761-4621

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MARY-CLARE HOGAN ROYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROYLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2008