THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 15:02:43 PM
Royle, Mary-Clare Hogan
CPSO#:
79207
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2003
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English, French
Education: Memorial University of Newfoundland Facu, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
CF Health Services Centre Ottawa
101 Colonel by Drive
Ottawa ON K1A 0K2
Phone: (613) 945-1111
Electoral District: 07
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:30 Jun 2008 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MARY-CLARE HOGAN ROYLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROYLE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2008 |