skip to content

Lanktree, Matthew Bruce

CPSO#: 98461

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of Nephrology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33323
Fax: 905-521-6088 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Laura VanderBeek Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. VanderBeek ( CPSO# 86380 )
Dr. M. Lanktree ( CPSO# 98461 )

Business Address:
385 St. Paul Avenue
Brantford ON  N3R 4N6
Phone Number: (519) 753-1242

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (416) 521-4099

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:21 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective:27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW BRUCE LANKTREE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANKTREE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Mar 2019
CF - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2017