THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 20:32:40 PM
Lanktree, Matthew Bruce
CPSO#:
98461
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
11 Jan 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Division of Nephrology
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON L8N 4A6
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 33323
Fax: 905-521-6088
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Brant Community Healthcare System |
Brantford |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:21 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:27 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MATTHEW BRUCE LANKTREE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LANKTREE is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 21 Sep 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
McMaster University, 22 Sep 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 21 Sep 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 22 Sep 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Nephrology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Mar 2019
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 11 Jan 2017 |