skip to content

Minuzzi, Luciano

CPSO#: 96960

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Apr 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Apr 2013
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:Fac Fed de Ciencias Med de Porto Alegre, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
Dept of Psychiatry and Behavioural
Neurosciences
100 West 5th St - Room C118
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35499
Fax: 905-381-5629 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: L. Minuzzi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Minuzzi ( CPSO# 96960 )

Business Address:
St Joseph's Healthcare
Department of Psychiatry and Behavioural Neuroscie
100 West 5th Street
Room C118
Hamilton ON  L8N 3K7
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 01 Jul 2019 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 15 Sep 2011 to 02 Dec 2011
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 03 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Dec 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Mar 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2019 Active
             1.    Dr. Luciano Minuzzi may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Psychiatry  and  Behavioural  Neurosciences,  Division  of  General
                        Psychiatry,  McMaster  University,  in  which  Dr. Minuzzi holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of  Associate Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires when Dr. Minuzzi no
                  longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.