THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:19:53 PM
Minuzzi, Luciano
CPSO#:
96960
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Apr 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Portuguese
Education: Fac Fed de Ciencias Med de Porto Alegre, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Healthcare
Dept of Psychiatry and Behavioural
Neurosciences
100 West 5th St - Room G102
Hamilton ON L8N 3K7
Phone: (905) 522-1155 Ext. 35448
Fax: 905-381-5629
Electoral District: 04
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:01 Jul 2019 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 15 Sep 2011 to 02 Dec 2011
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 03 Dec 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Psychiatry
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 21 Oct 2011 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Dec 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Mar 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Apr 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2019 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2024 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 07 Mar 2024 |
|
Active |