skip to content

Liontos, Larissa Martha

CPSO#: 98488

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave, B204
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. 4393 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Anastasios Papadopoulos Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 04 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Papadopoulos ( CPSO# 86674 )
Dr. L. Liontos ( CPSO# 98488 )

Business Address:
Toronto Allergy Group
Suite 404
650 Sammon Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 5M5
Phone Number: (416) 465-7999

Business Address:
840 Coxwell Ave
Michael Garron Hospital Medical Centre
Toronto Allergy Group
Third floor - Suite 305
East York ON  M4C 5T2
Phone Number: 416-465-7999

Business Address:
B204 - 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LARISSA MARTHA LIONTOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIONTOS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018