THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 12:41:33 PM
Liontos, Larissa Martha
CPSO#:
98488
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Toronto, 2012
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave, B204
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. 4393
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
North York General Hospital |
Toronto |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Toronto East Health Network |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2018 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. LARISSA MARTHA LIONTOS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LIONTOS is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2018 |