Kucharczyk, Michael Jonathan (CPSO#: 98565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University College, Cork, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Radiation Oncology
Jewish General Hospital
750 Côte-des-Neiges Rd
Montreal QC  H3S 1Y9
Phone: (514) 340-8222
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Postgraduate Medical Education
McMaster University
Room MDCL - 3101A
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Canada
Phone: (905) 525-9140
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec
Saskatchewan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 18 Apr 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JONATHAN KUCHARCZYK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUCHARCZYK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 24 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 25 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2018