skip to content

Koushan, Keyvan

CPSO#: 86788

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 29 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:University Of Toronto, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mt. Sinai Hospital Eye Clinic
Rm L1-001
60 Murray St.
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 5151
Fax: (416) 586-8789 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Toronto Retina Institute
6 Maginn Mews
Unit 208
North York ON  M3C 0G9
Canada
Phone: 416-449-3937
Fax: 416-449-0874
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1420 Burnhamthorpe Rd E; Unit 415
Mississauga ON  L4X 2Z9
Canada
Phone: (905) 232-7722
Fax: (905) 232-0674
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

9080 Yonge St.
Unit 12, Level 2
Grand Genesis Health(Richmond Hill
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
Phone: (289) 597-7676
Fax: (289) 597-7675
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Keyvan Koushan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Koushan ( CPSO# 86788 )

Business Address:
9080 Yonge St
Unit 12, Level 2
Grand Genesis Health(Richmond Hill Medical & Surgi
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (289) 597-7676

Business Address:
Toronto Retina Institute
Suite 208
6 Maginn Mews
North York ON  M3C 0G9
Phone Number: (416) 449-3937

Business Address:
Suite 415
1420 Burnhamthorpe Road East
Mississauga ON  L4X 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 232-7722

Business Address:
60 Murray Street
Room L1-001
Toronto ON  M5T 3L9
Phone Number: (416) 586-4800


Corporation Name: Chow Berger Koushan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Berger ( CPSO# 52456 )
Dr. D. Chow ( CPSO# 62433 )
Dr. K. Koushan ( CPSO# 86788 )

Business Address:
Toronto Retina Institute
Suite 208
6 Maginn Mews
Toronto ON  M3C 0G9
Phone Number: (416) 449-3937

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KEYVAN KOUSHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUSHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 2014