THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 8:44:58 AM
Koushan, Keyvan
CPSO#:
86788
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
29 Jan 2014
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
29 Jan 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: University of Toronto, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Mt. Sinai Hospital Eye Clinic
Rm L1-001
60 Murray St.
Toronto ON M5T 3L9
Phone: 416-586-4800 Ext. 5151
Fax: (416) 586-8789
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Kensington Eye Institute |
Toronto |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KEYVAN KOUSHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KOUSHAN is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
McMaster University, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 29 Jan 2014 |