skip to content

Wagner, Karen Elizabeth

CPSO#: 109864

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Bascom, Karen Elizabeth (used until: 11 Jan 2018 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kawartha Cardiology Clinic
327 Charlotte St
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone: (705) 775-5924
Fax: (705) 775-5927 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. William Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hughes ( CPSO# 31872 )
Dr. M. Hartleib ( CPSO# 72592 )
Dr. K. Doucet ( CPSO# 90737 )
Dr. K. Wagner ( CPSO# 109864)

Business Address:
23 Front Street South
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7129 Gelert Road
P.O. Box 870, 2nd Floor
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 475-1212

Business Address:
Suite 204
327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone Number: (705) 743-3555

Business Address:
North Hastings Family Health Team
1P Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0


Corporation Name: Dr. K.E. Wagner Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 27 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wagner ( CPSO# 109864)

Business Address:
Kawartha Cardiology Clinic
327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone Number: (705) 740-2043

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 743-2121

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 26 Aug 2016
PEAP - CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 27 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Cardiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 May 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2019 Active
             Dr. Karen Elizabeth Wagner may practise medicine independently in cardiology.