skip to content

Hartleib, Michael Charles

CPSO#: 72592

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1998
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Oct 2002

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
327 Charlotte Street
Suite 204
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone: 705 775-0320
Fax: (705) 775-0128 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Canada
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. William Hughes Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Hughes ( CPSO# 31872 )
Dr. M. Hartleib ( CPSO# 72592 )
Dr. K. Doucet ( CPSO# 90737 )
Dr. K. Wagner ( CPSO# 109864)

Business Address:
23 Front Street South
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Business Address:
Northumberland Hills Hospital
1000 Depalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Business Address:
Haliburton Family Medical Centre
7129 Gelert Road
P.O. Box 870, 2nd Floor
Haliburton ON  K0M 1S0
Phone Number: (705) 475-1212

Business Address:
Suite 204
327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone Number: (705) 743-3555

Business Address:
North Hastings Family Health Team
1P Manor Lane
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0


Corporation Name: Michael C. Hartleib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 28 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Hartleib ( CPSO# 72592 )

Business Address:
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6

Business Address:
Suite 402
327 Charlotte Street
Peterborough ON  K9J 0B2
Phone Number: (705) 775-0320

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:12 Oct 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MICHAEL CHARLES HARTLEIB may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HARTLEIB is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Sep 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2002