skip to content

Gill, Kulwant Singh

CPSO#: 64274

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 1991
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1991

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:Punjabi University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1380 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z4
Phone: (705) 523-1550
Fax: (705) 523-1542 Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kulwant Gill Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 13 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gill ( CPSO# 64274 )
Dr. R. Kaur ( CPSO# 85755 )

Business Address:
1380 Regent Street
Sudbury ON  P3E 3Z4
Phone Number: (705) 523-1550


Corporation Name: R. Kaur Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Gill ( CPSO# 64274 )
Dr. R. Kaur ( CPSO# 85755 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Laurentian Site
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 522-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective:16 Dec 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Internal Medicine Effective:06 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:19 Nov 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KULWANT SINGH GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1991