THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 14:06:44 PM
Gill, Kulwant Singh
CPSO#:
64274
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
02 Jul 1991
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
02 Jul 1991
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi
Education: Punjabi University, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1380 Regent Street
Sudbury ON P3E 3Z4
Phone: (705) 523-1550
Fax: (705) 523-1542
Electoral District: 08
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Health Sciences North |
Sudbury |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Hematological Pathology |
Effective:16 Dec 1988 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:06 Jun 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Hematology |
Effective:19 Nov 1991 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KULWANT SINGH GILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GILL is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jul 1991 |
Concerns
Source:
Other
Active Date: January 25, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Charges
Kulwant Singh Gill was charged with the following offence:
1. Indecent assault on a named person between the March 1, 1982 and September 30, 1983, contrary to former section 149 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
Date of Charge: November 16, 2021
Place of Charge: Toronto, Ontario
Toronto Police Services
Source:
Other
Active Date: January 25, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Bail Conditions
On November 15, 2021, the following Conditions of Release (Bail Conditions) were imposed on Kulwant Singh Gill:
1. Gill must notify specified police officer of any change to his address, occupation and employment.
2. Gill must not communicate, directly or indirectly, with named person.
3. Gill must not go within 200 meters of anyplace named person lives, works or happens to be.