skip to content

Jaffer, Iqbal Haider

CPSO#: 95481

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2020
EXPIRY DATE
31 Dec 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
237 Barton St E
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Sabira S. Kanani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kanani ( CPSO# 95311 )
Dr. I. Jaffer ( CPSO# 95481 )

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Jurvavinski Hospital
711 Concession Street
Hamilton ON  L8V 1C3
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective:01 Jul 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Cardiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 May 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2020 Active
             1.    Dr.  Iqbal  Haider  Jaffer  may practiseCardiac Surgery in Ontario, while
                  under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires six months from the
                  date of issuance or when Dr.  Jaffer's  eligibility  to  take  the  Royal
                  College  of  Physicians  and  Surgeons  of  Canada  examination  expires,
                  whichever comes first.

            3.    The  certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events,  unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (I)   the  supervisor  notifies the College of any concerns regarding Dr.
                        Jaffer's knowledge, skill, judgment or professionalism, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Jaffer's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate  is issued on July 1, 2020, and will expire on or before
                  December 31, 2020, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.