THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 7:03:40 AM
Jaffer, Iqbal Haider
CPSO#:
95481
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2020
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
22 Sep 2021
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Queensland Faculty of Medi, 2009
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
HHSC Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
237 Barton St E
McMaster Wing Rm 515
Hamilton ON L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 44553
Fax: 905-577-1405
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Australia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site |
Hamilton |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Cardiac Surgery |
Effective:15 Jun 2021 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. IQBAL HAIDER JAFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JAFFER is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 23 Sep 2011
AVP - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 24 Sep 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2017 to 31 Dec 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Dec 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2019 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2019 to 31 Dec 2019
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2020 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Cardiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Dec 2020
CF - Cardiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jun 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Dec 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2021 |