First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 23 Sep 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2011 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 02 Oct 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Oct 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 May 2014 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Jun 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2018 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jun 2019 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Dec 2019 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2020 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Dec 2020 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Feb 2021 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2021 |