skip to content

Nigl, Jeffrey Tobias

CPSO#: 107868

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Jun 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Wayne State University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Pain Care Clinics
106-2464 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 3V6
Phone: 226-782-7246
Fax: 226-782-7246 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey Nigl Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 22 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Nigl ( CPSO# 107868)
Dr. C. Blue ( CPSO# 94354 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (519) 973-4401

Business Address:
1083 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 4J8
Phone Number: (519) 915-7125


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Hawaii

USA - Michigan

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2015
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Aug 2015
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Feb 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2018

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2018 Active
             Dr.  Jeffrey  Tobias  Nigl  may  practise  medicine  independently in emergency
            medicine.

The CPSO will be closed on Friday, April 19, 2019 for the statutory holiday. We will reopen at 8 a.m. on Monday, April 22.