First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2010 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Sep 2010 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 31 Aug 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 09 Nov 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 26 Mar 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 26 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Oct 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 31 Oct 2014 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Apr 2015 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Apr 2015 |