skip to content

Jin, Eddy Yong Hyun

CPSO#: 78890

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Mar 2003
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 12 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
North York General Hospital
Room 1NE - 126
4001 Leslie Street
M2K 1E1
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Phone: (416) 756-6882 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Eddy Y. H. Jin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jin ( CPSO# 78890 )

Business Address:
North York General Hospital
Emergency Department
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Phone Number: (416) 756-6000


Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Y. Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jin ( CPSO# 78890 )
Dr. A. Li ( CPSO# 92883 )

Business Address:
5080 - 3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone Number: (416) 782-4447

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDDY YONG HYUN JIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2003