skip to content

Li, Amanda Yvonne

CPSO#: 92883

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 5080
3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone: (416) 782-4447
Fax: (416) 782-1284 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Palliative Care Unit
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N3N5
Canada
Phone: 416-480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York General Hospital
4100 Leslie St
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 756-6000
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Amanda Y. Li Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Jin ( CPSO# 78890 )
Dr. A. Li ( CPSO# 92883 )

Business Address:
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto ON  M2K 1E1

Business Address:
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Business Address:
5080 - 3080 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4N 3N1
Phone Number: (416) 782-4447

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMANDA YVONNE LI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012