skip to content

Castano Herrera, Elkin Dario

CPSO#: 78746

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Mar 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education: Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056 Station C
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 744-7361
Fax: (519) 744-7363 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Natasha Yepes Restrepo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Castano Herrera ( CPSO# 78746 )
Dr. N. Yepes Restrepo ( CPSO# 79369 )

Business Address:
31 Kingsway Drive
Suite 501
Kitchener ON  N2A 2L9
Phone Number: (519) 745-6556


Corporation Name: Castano Herrera Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Castano Herrera ( CPSO# 78746 )
Dr. N. Yepes Restrepo ( CPSO# 79369 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
P.O. Box 9056 Station C
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 744-7361

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:01 Jan 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELKIN DARIO CASTANO HERRERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTANO HERRERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 24 Mar 2003
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2003 to 28 Sep 2003
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 29 Sep 2003 to 29 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Sep 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2003
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Mar 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2004
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2005
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Feb 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2008