THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
03/05/24 12:39:31 PM
Castano Herrera, Elkin Dario
CPSO#:
78746
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
24 Mar 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Mar 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Spanish
Education: Universidad Pontificia Bolivariana, 1993
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
835 King Street West
P O Box 9056 Station C
Kitchener ON N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 744-7361
Fax: (519) 744-7363
Electoral District: 03
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Grand River Hospital Corporation |
Kitchener |
St Mary's General Hospital |
Kitchener |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:01 Jan 2007 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ELKIN DARIO CASTANO HERRERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CASTANO HERRERA is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2003 to 24 Mar 2003
PEAP - CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 25 Mar 2003 to 28 Sep 2003
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 29 Sep 2003 to 29 Mar 2004
International Specialist Physician - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2003 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2003 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2003 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Mar 2004 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2004 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jul 2005 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 19 Feb 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Mar 2008 |