skip to content

Gunawardena, Dishani Thilakshini

CPSO#: 99566

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Mar 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Saba University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5025 Yonge St
Suite 201
Toronto ON  M2P 2S2
Phone: 647-846-3777
Fax: 647-846-3779 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Balasuriya & Gunawardena Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 11 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Balasuriya ( CPSO# 96604 )
Dr. D. Gunawardena ( CPSO# 99566 )

Business Address:
201 - 5025 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M2N 5P2
Phone Number: (647) 846-3777

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Feb 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DISHANI THILAKSHINI GUNAWARDENA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GUNAWARDENA is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Oct 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 24 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2014